OK HB1234 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1234
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Court records; creating the Court Records Protection and Modernization Act; effective date.
Title
Court records; creating the Court Records Protection and Modernization Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2017-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-20 | House | General Order |
2017-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Osburn (Mike) |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1234 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 2 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1005 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |