OK HB1230 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Vetoed 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Vetoed 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; certificate of title; license agents; effective date; emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; certificate of title; license agents; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: R (Y: 69 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: R (Y: 69 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Vetoed 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-19 | CCR read | |
2011-05-18 | To Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-18 | House Rule suspended | |
2011-05-18 | CCR ruled not germane | |
2011-05-18 | Considered | |
2011-05-17 | Title restored | |
2011-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Mazzei, Brinkley, Aldridge, Treat, Wilson, Ivester | |
2011-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-04-12 | SA's received | |
2011-04-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-11 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-11 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-31 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2011-03-31 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-03-02 | First Reading | |
2011-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3 | |
2011-03-01 | General Order | |
2011-02-21 | Removed from Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Placed on Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-17 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Ownbey | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |