OK HB1228 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1228
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children; directing the Department of Human Services to disseminate information when a child is eligible for adoption; authorizing reimbursement; effective date.
Title
Children; directing the Department of Human Services to disseminate information when a child is eligible for adoption; authorizing reimbursement; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tammy West [R] | Sen. Paul Scott [R] | Rep. John Enns [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-06 | House | Amended |
2017-03-06 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-03-06 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Scott (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Enns |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2017-02-15 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative West (Tammy) |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1228 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Referred to Appropriations