OK HB1206 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1206
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public health; requiring assisted living centers to provide certain information to residents; effective date.
Title
Public health; requiring assisted living centers to provide certain information to residents; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Bush |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1206 (Carry Over) 2019-02-19 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee