OK HB1198 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1198
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans; requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs to create a veterans' registry; hunting and fishing licenses; effective dates.
Title
Veterans; requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs to create a veterans' registry; hunting and fishing licenses; effective dates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Approved by Governor 05/12/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-08 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-04 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-20 | House | Amended |
2017-03-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Hardin |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1198 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 4 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 4 | 112 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 4 | 114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 4 | 140 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 5 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 124 | New Code | See Bill Text |