OK HB1162 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1162
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers' Retirement System; enacting the Pension Protection Act; Teachers’ Retirement System; retirement eligibility; effective date.
Title
Teachers' Retirement System; enacting the Pension Protection Act; Teachers’ Retirement System; retirement eligibility; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services & Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services & Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 7 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 5 |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-02-23 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-23 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1162 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 17 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 17 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |