OK HB1159 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Court records; authorizing certain entities and persons to obtain birth date information; effective date.
Title
Court records; authorizing certain entities and persons to obtain birth date information; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 2 |
2019-03-04 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Scott (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1159 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee