OK HB1156 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1156
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety; Vessel and Motor Registration Act; exempting canoes, kayaks and paddleboats from title and registration requirements; effective date.
Title
Public safety; Vessel and Motor Registration Act; exempting canoes, kayaks and paddleboats from title and registration requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Approved by Governor 04/04/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1156 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2019