OK HB1150 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1150
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; The Plumbing License Law of 1955; modifying powers of the Construction Industries Board.
Title
Professions and occupations; The Plumbing License Law of 1955; modifying powers of the Construction Industries Board.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Osburn [R] | Sen. Cody Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 18 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 38; Ayes: 54 Nays: 38 |
2021-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-01 | House | General Order |
2021-02-03 | House | Emergency added |
2021-02-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Osburn |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1150 (Carry Over) 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021