OK HB1149 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1149
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Authored by Senator Silk (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Authored by Senator Silk (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Soldiers and sailors; eliminating authorization to transfer veterans center location; repealer; effective date.
Title
Soldiers and sailors; eliminating authorization to transfer veterans center location; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Silk (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Grego |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1149 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - Authored by Senator Silk (principal Senate author)