OK HB1149 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Vetoed 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Vetoed 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wills and succession; requiring strict application of in terrorem clause if will contest fails; effective date.
Title
Wills and succession; requiring strict application of in terrorem clause if will contest fails; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Vetoed 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-02 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Grau |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |