OK HB1144 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1144
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; authorizing the commission of certain peace officers; powers and duties; declaring officers are not employees of the Department of Public Safety; emergency.
Title
State government; authorizing the commission of certain peace officers; powers and duties; declaring officers are not employees of the Department of Public Safety; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | House | Approved by Governor 04/19/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 8 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 14 |
2023-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-20 | House | General Order |
2023-03-01 | House | Emergency added |
2023-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1144 (Carry Over) 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2023