OK HB1120 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1120
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; notification of outstanding warrants; specifying sheriffs are authorized to contract with certain associations to administer contracts; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; notification of outstanding warrants; specifying sheriffs are authorized to contract with certain associations to administer contracts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Approved by Governor 05/01/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 5 |
2018-03-15 | House | Amended |
2018-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-03-05 | House | Remove Representative Biggs as principal House author and substitute with Representative Cockroft |
2018-03-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1120 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 514 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 514 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |