OK HB1120 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Mortgages; authorizing title insurance company to recover certain penalty; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mortgages; authorizing title insurance company to recover certain penalty; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Banking and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-27HouseApproved by Governor 04/27/2015
2015-04-21HouseSent to Governor
2015-04-21SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2015-04-21HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2015-04-20HouseReferred for enrollment
2015-04-20SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2015-04-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2015-04-20SenateAmendment restored bill to engrossed version
2015-04-20SenateTitle restored
2015-04-20SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-03-31SenateTitle stricken
2015-03-31SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2015-03-17SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2015-03-04SenateFirst Reading
2015-03-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-03-03HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-03-03HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2015-03-03HouseAuthored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author)
2015-03-03HouseGeneral Order
2015-02-17HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking and Financial Services Committee
2015-02-04HouseReferred to Banking and Financial Services
2015-02-04HouseWithdrawn from Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate Committee
2015-02-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate
2015-02-02HouseAuthored by Representative Russ
2015-02-02HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback