OK HB1119 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Title insurance; authorizing a title insurance company to execute and record certain records in certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Title insurance; authorizing a title insurance company to execute and record certain records in certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-03 | House | General Order |
2015-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |