OK HB1117 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1117
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State government; exempting certain individuals from state park entrance fees; effective date.
Title
State government; exempting certain individuals from state park entrance fees; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick West [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Tourism |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative West (Rick) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1117 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee