OK HB1109 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1109
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioners of the Land Office; school land funds; directing distribution to state colleges and junior colleges; equal distribution; effective date; emergency.
Title
Commissioners of the Land Office; school land funds; directing distribution to state colleges and junior colleges; equal distribution; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin West [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1109 (Carry Over) 2019-02-20 - Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)