OK HB1102 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1102
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Physician licensure; unprofessional conduct; abortion; effective date.
Title
Physician licensure; unprofessional conduct; abortion; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Olsen [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Rep. Rick West [R] |
Rep. Tammy West [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Rep. Jay Steagall [R] |
Rep. Marilyn Stark [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] | Rep. Kenton Patzkowsky [R] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] |
Rep. Robert Manger [R] | Rep. David Hardin [R] | Rep. Jim Grego [R] | Rep. Sheila Dills [R] |
Rep. Brad Boles [R] | Rep. Max Wolfley [R] | Rep. Wendi Stearman [R] | Rep. Gerrid Kendrix [R] |
Rep. Mike Dobrinski [R] | Rep. Sherrie Conley [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] |
Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] |
Sen. Blake Stephens [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 10 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2021-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Steagall |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 18 |
2021-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Gann, Dobrinski, Patzkowsky, West (Tammy), Manger, Roberts (Sean), Lepak, Dills |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard, Allen |
2021-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Rick), Hardin (David), Boles, Conley, Smith, West (Kevin), Humphrey, Russ, Stark, CrosswhiteHader, McDugle, Grego, Wolfley, Kendrix, Mize, ODonnell, Lawson, Stearman |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Olsen |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1102 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021