OK HB1100 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Courts; modifying various sections related to certification standards for courtroom interpreters; effective date.
Title
Courts; modifying various sections related to certification standards for courtroom interpreters; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 |
2015-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-09 | House | General Order |
2015-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |