OK HB1090 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1090
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Teachers' Retirement System of Oklahoma; out-of-state teaching service credit; effective dates.
Title
Public retirement systems; Teachers' Retirement System of Oklahoma; out-of-state teaching service credit; effective dates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 1 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 1 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-07 | House | Amended |
2019-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Osburn |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1090 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance