OK HB1080 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Simpson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Simpson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; reducing certain apportionment; creating apportionment for certain county roads; effective date; emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; reducing certain apportionment; creating apportionment for certain county roads; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Simpson |
2013-05-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft, Biggs |
2013-05-22 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2013-05-21 | House | HC's named: GCCA |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-11 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-03 | Senate | coauthored by Fields, Ivester |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Finance committee |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2013-03-14 | Senate | coauthored by Griffin |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Griffin; authored by Senator Marlatt |
2013-03-12 | Senate | coauthored by Cox |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 9 |
2013-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer |
2013-03-11 | House | General Order |
2013-03-04 | House | Title stricken |
2013-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey, Lockhart, Smalley |
2013-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Sanders |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |