OK HB1077 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Railroads; requiring contract renegotiations and reporting by Department of Transportation.
Title
Railroads; requiring contract renegotiations and reporting by Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 48 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Transportation Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Perryman |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 23; Ayes: 48 Nays: 30 |
2015-02-19 | House | General Order |
2015-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Pittman (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Morrissette |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
66 | 324 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
66 | 328 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |