OK HB1062 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Economic improvement; Oklahoma Quick Action Closing Fund; rebate payments to a high-impact production; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic improvement; Oklahoma Quick Action Closing Fund; rebate payments to a high-impact production; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseEmergency added
2019-02-28HouseTitle stricken
2019-02-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Blancett
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-25HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Dunnington
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback