OK HB1061 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1061
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; Child Abuse Prevention Act; dissemination of birth records; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; Child Abuse Prevention Act; dissemination of birth records; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 15 |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire |
2019-02-28 | House | Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Davis |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2019-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1061 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services