OK HB1061 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; authorizing use of flashing red and blue lights on certain vehicles; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; authorizing use of flashing red and blue lights on certain vehicles; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Approved by Governor 04/20/2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-14 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-13 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-13 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2011-04-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 5 | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Sanders | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 12 | 227 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 12 | 229 | New Code | See Bill Text |