OK HB1058 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; claims processing; institutions within Oklahoma State System of Higher Education; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public finance; claims processing; institutions within Oklahoma State System of Higher Education; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Approved by Governor 05/06/2015 |
2015-04-30 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-30 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-29 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-29 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2015-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-19 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Casey |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |