OK HB1052 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Coauthored by Representative Luttrell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Soldiers and sailors; specifying certain program shall provide reimbursement for unpaid interment or cremation; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Soldiers and sailors; specifying certain program shall provide reimbursement for unpaid interment or cremation; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Luttrell
2019-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
2019-03-06HouseAuthored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
2019-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Veterans and Military Affairs
2019-02-13HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Burns
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback