OK HB1048 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; modifying collection of delinquent taxes. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; modifying collection of delinquent taxes. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-06 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Approved by Governor 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-07 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-05-07 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2 | |
2009-05-06 | SA's read, adopted | |
2009-04-15 | SA's received | |
2009-04-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-03-24 | coauthored by Liebmann | |
2009-03-24 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to General Government | |
2009-03-17 | Withdrawn from Finance committee | |
2009-03-16 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Liebmann | |
2009-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 36 | |
2009-03-03 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | Authored by Senator Aldridge (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Banz | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 3106 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 3113 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 3131 | New Code | See Bill Text |