OK HB1047 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; adding certain offense; increasing penalty and fine; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; adding certain offense; increasing penalty and fine; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Approved by Governor 05/11/2015 |
2015-05-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-05-05 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-04 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jordan |
2015-05-04 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2015-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | 4th reading and signing rescinded |
2015-04-29 | House | To Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Fourth Reading and signing rescinded |
2015-04-29 | House | Recalled from enrollment |
2015-04-28 | House | Returned by Governor |
2015-04-28 | House | Recalled from Governor by HCR 1009 |
2015-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-09 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-09 | House | General Order |
2015-02-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1024 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 13 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |