OK HB1045 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1045
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial highways and bridges; designating various memorial highways and bridges; effective date.
Title
Memorial highways and bridges; designating various memorial highways and bridges; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Coleman; authored by Senator Standridge |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2021-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Amended |
2021-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe |
2021-03-11 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | Emergency removed |
2021-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Frix |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Luttrell |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1045 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed