OK HB1034 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1034
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Banking; providing certain powers and authorities for authorized signers on deposit accounts; modifying requirements for certain beneficiaries for Payable on Death deposit accounts; effective date.
Title
Banking; providing certain powers and authorities for authorized signers on deposit accounts; modifying requirements for certain beneficiaries for Payable on Death deposit accounts; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Garry Mize [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-23 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2021-02-23 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Mize |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1034 (Carry Over) 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021