OK HB1034 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; Oklahoma Central Purchasing Act; modifying powers and duties of State Purchasing Director; effective date.
Title
State government; Oklahoma Central Purchasing Act; modifying powers and duties of State Purchasing Director; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - House - House: (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/11/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 7 | |
2011-05-04 | SA's read, adopted | |
2011-04-13 | SA's received | |
2011-04-13 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-12 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-12 | Title restored | |
2011-04-12 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2011-03-29 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-03-02 | First Reading | |
2011-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 4 | |
2011-03-01 | Authored by Senator Aldridge (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Derby | |
2011-03-01 | General Order | |
2011-02-21 | Removed from Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Placed on Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-21 | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Murphey | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 85 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |