OK HB1030 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; employee licenses; prior felony convictions; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; employee licenses; prior felony convictions; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 5
2019-03-05HouseAuthored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
2019-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Burns
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback