OK HB1029 | 2023 | First Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 06/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 06/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; creating the Caring for Caregivers Act; creating family caregiver tax credit; credit caps; authorizing Tax Commission to promulgate rules; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; creating the Caring for Caregivers Act; creating family caregiver tax credit; credit caps; authorizing Tax Commission to promulgate rules; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Sen. Roger Thompson [R] | Rep. Ryan Martinez [R] | Rep. Tammy West [R] |
Rep. Max Wolfley [R] | Sen. Chuck Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | House | Becomes law without Governor's signature 06/02/2023 |
2023-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-05-26 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11 |
2023-05-26 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2023-05-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-05-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-05-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-05-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2023-05-24 | House | JCR adopted |
2023-05-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wolfley, West (Tammy) |
2023-05-24 | House | General Order |
2023-05-23 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2023-05-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2023-05-17 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall |
2023-05-17 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) |
2023-05-17 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace, Martinez |
2023-05-17 | House | First Reading |