OK HB1023 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Approved by Governor 03/29/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher compensation; modifying salary amounts; providing salary increases; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher compensation; modifying salary amounts; providing salary increases; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseApproved by Governor 03/29/2018
2018-03-29HouseSent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-03-29HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-03-29HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-03-29HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2018-03-29HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Rogers
2018-03-29HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
2018-03-29HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), McBride
2018-03-29HouseSA's read, adopted
2018-03-28HouseSA's received
2018-03-28SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-28SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-28SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4
2018-03-28SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-03-27SenateDirect to Calendar
2018-03-26SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-26HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-26HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 1
2018-03-26HouseAmended by floor substitute
2018-03-26HouseHouse Rule suspended
2018-03-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McCall
2018-03-26HouseGeneral Order
2018-03-26HouseWithdrawn from Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2018-02-05HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Fields
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace, Casey
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7018114New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback