OK HB1023 | 2013 | Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-04 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]

Summary

Civil procedure; modifying grounds and procedure to obtaining stay of enforcement of judgment; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure; modifying grounds and procedure to obtaining stay of enforcement of judgment; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2013-09-03HouseAuthored by Representative Perryman
2013-09-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
129904New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback