OK HB1022 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Returned by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Children; creating the Task Force on Trauma-Informed Care; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; creating the Task Force on Trauma-Informed Care; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseReturned by Governor
2019-05-08HouseRecalled from Governor by HCR 1007
2019-05-02HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-02SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-02HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-01HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-01HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 9
2019-05-01HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Floyd
2019-05-01HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-23HouseSA's received
2019-04-23SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 10
2019-04-22SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-04-22SenateTitle restored
2019-04-22SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-04-22SenateEmergency added
2019-04-22SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Hicks
2019-04-17SenateCoauthored by Senator Ikley-Freeman
2019-04-10SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-10SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-04-08SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-21SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 6
2019-02-20HouseAuthored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
2019-02-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Lawson
2019-02-20HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-07HouseCR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Bush
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1022&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1022%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1022%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1022%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1022%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1022%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1022%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1022%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1022_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1022_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback