OK HB1014 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transportation funding; Rebuilding Oklahoma Access and Driver Safety Fund; modifying calculation; apportionment of motor vehicle fees, taxes and penalties; contingency; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation funding; Rebuilding Oklahoma Access and Driver Safety Fund; modifying calculation; apportionment of motor vehicle fees, taxes and penalties; contingency; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseApproved by Governor 04/23/2018
2018-04-17HouseSent to Governor
2018-04-17SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-17HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-04-17HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-04-17HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 8
2018-04-17HouseSA's read, adopted
2018-04-16HouseSA's considered and laid over
2018-03-29HouseSA's received
2018-03-29SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-29SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-29SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2018-03-29SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-03-27SenateDirect to Calendar
2018-03-26SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-26HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-26HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 11
2018-03-26HouseEmergency removed
2018-03-26HouseAmended by floor substitute
2018-03-26HouseHouse Rule suspended
2018-03-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McEntire, Bush
2018-03-26HouseGeneral Order
2018-03-26HouseWithdrawn from Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2018-02-05HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Fields
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace, Casey
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback