OK HB1007 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1007
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring professional development program to include consent and healthy relationships education; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring professional development program to include consent and healthy relationships education; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jacob Rosecrants [D] | Sen. Carri Hicks [D] | Rep. Chris Kannady [R] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] |
Rep. Dean Davis [R] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 25 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 25 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Motion expired |
2019-03-13 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Rosecrants |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 56 |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Ayes: 25 Nays: 56 |
2019-03-13 | House | Motion to table amendment failed |
2019-03-13 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading rescinded |
2019-03-13 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Randleman |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered |
2019-03-13 | House | Laid over |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Third Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Hicks (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Kannady, Randleman, Davis |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bush |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Rosecrants |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1007 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Motion expired