OK HB1007 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; requiring professional development program to include consent and healthy relationships education; effective date;emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; requiring professional development program to include consent and healthy relationships education; effective date;emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 25 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseMotion expired
2019-03-13HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Rosecrants
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 56
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseAyes: 25 Nays: 56
2019-03-13HouseMotion to table amendment failed
2019-03-13HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading rescinded
2019-03-13HouseRemove as coauthor Representative(s) Randleman
2019-03-13HouseConsidered
2019-03-13HouseLaid over
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Third Reading
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseAuthored by Senator Hicks (principal Senate author)
2019-03-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Kannady, Randleman, Davis
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bush
2019-02-13HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Rosecrants
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback