OH SCR18 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Passed on November 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-27 - Introduced and Referred to Committee: Health
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To urge Congress to amend the Americans with Disabilities Act and adopt an international symbol of access that includes a dynamic character leaning forward with a sense of movement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt international symbol of access having sense of movement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-27HouseIntroduced and Referred to Committee: Health
2018-11-15HouseOffered
2018-11-14SenateAdopted
2018-09-26SenateReported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2017-12-05SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2017-11-29SenateOffered

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback