OH SCR11 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Introduced and Referred to Committee: Government Oversight
Pending: House Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Introduced and Referred to Committee: Government Oversight
Pending: House Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To request an Act of the United States Congress to designate the Kol Israel Foundation Holocaust Memorial, located in Zion Memorial Park in Bedford, Ohio, as a National Memorial.
Title
Ask Congress to designate Kol Israel Memorial a National Memorial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Government Oversight |
2022-03-31 | House | Offered |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported: General Government Budget Committee |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Refer to Committee: General Government Budget Committee |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Offered |