OH SB97 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on October 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3727.44 and 3727.45, to enact sections 3727.40, 3727.41, and 3902.32, and to repeal section 5162.80 of the Revised Code regarding the provision of health care cost estimates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to providing estimates for health care preauthorization

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-10-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-22HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-10-11HouseIntroduced
2019-10-09SenatePassed
2019-10-07SenateReported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-03-12SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37New CodeSee Bill Text
3727Amended CodeCitation Text
372740New CodeSee Bill Text
372741New CodeSee Bill Text
372744Amended CodeCitation Text
372745Amended CodeCitation Text
39New CodeSee Bill Text
3902New CodeSee Bill Text
390232New CodeSee Bill Text
51Repealed CodeCitation Text
5162Repealed CodeCitation Text
516280Repealed CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback