OH SB81 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3319.22 and 3319.223 and to enact section 3319.227 of the Revised Code to qualify Teach for America participants for a resident educator license.
Title
To qualify Teach for America participants for a resident educator license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-03-15 | Committee Report | |
2011-02-16 | To Education | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced to House | |
2011-03-23 | To Education | |
2011-03-23 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 19 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 223 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 227 | New Code | See Bill Text |