OH SB361 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-17 - Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-17 - Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 135.63, 135.78, 1733.04, and 1733.24 and to enact sections 135.79, 135.791, 135.792, 135.793, 135.794, 135.795, and 135.796 of the Revised Code to create the adoption linked deposit program.
Title
Create adoption linked deposit program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions |
2020-09-30 | House | Introduced |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Passed |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Introduced |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 35 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 35 | 78 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 35 | 79 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 35 | 791 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 35 | 792 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 35 | 793 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 35 | 794 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 35 | 795 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 35 | 796 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 33 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |