OH SB34 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-17 - Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
Pending: House Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-17 - Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
Pending: House Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2953.25, 3314.03, 3314.101, 3319.151, 3319.227, 3319.31, 3319.311, 3319.313, 3319.316, 3319.40, 3319.99, 3326.081, 3326.11, 3328.18, 3328.24, and 5153.176 and to enact sections 3319.0812, 3319.318, 3319.319, 3319.393, 3319.394, and 3319.47 of the Revised Code regarding school employee employment and educator licensure and conduct.
Title
Regards school employment, educator licensure, and conduct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2020-09-30 | House | Introduced |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Education |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 53 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 14 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 19 | 0812 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 19 | 151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 313 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 318 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 19 | 319 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 19 | 393 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 19 | 394 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 19 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 19 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 26 | 081 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 28 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 28 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 53 | 176 | Amended Code | Citation Text |