OH SB303 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1751.91, 3923.89, 4723.28, 4729.01, 4729.39, 4730.25, and 5164.14 of the Revised Code regarding pharmacist consult agreements.
Title
Regards pharmacist consult agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2020-05-11 | House | Introduced |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Passed |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Reported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 51 | 91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 89 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 23 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 30 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 64 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |