OH SB301 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-27)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 3719.41, 4715.033, 4715.034, 4715.30, 4715.301, 4715.302, 4723.487, 4725.092, 4729.162, 4729.291, 4729.51, 4729.552, 4729.57, 4729.79, 4729.80, 4729.86, 4730.53, 4731.054, 4731.055, 4731.22, and 4731.39 of the Revised Code regarding enforcement powers of certain health care professional licensing boards, regulation of pain management clinics, limits on prescriber-furnished controlled substances, and classifications of certain controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding enforcement powers of certain health care professional licensing boards, regulation of pain management clinics, limits on prescriber-furnished controlled substances, and classifications of certain controlled substances.

Sponsors

Rep Denise Driehaus [D]Rep Bill Patmon [D]Rep Sean O'Brien [D]Rep Terry Johnson [R]
Sen Charleta Tavares [D]Sen Bill Beagle [R]Rep Andy Thompson [R]Rep Craig Newbold [R]
Rep Casey Kozlowski [R]Rep Bill Hayes [R]Rep Mike Duffey [R]Rep Mike Dovilla [R]
Rep Margaret Ruhl [R]Rep Debbie Phillips [D]Rep Jeffrey McClain [R]Sen Peggy Lehner [R]
Rep Robert Hackett [R]Rep Cliff Rosenberger [R]Rep Ron Young [R]Rep Gary Scherer [R]
Rep Ryan Smith [R]Sen Bob Peterson [R]Rep Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep Louis Terhar [R]
Rep Christina Hagan [R]Rep Robert Sprague [R]Sen Larry Obhof [R]Sen Gayle Manning [R]
Sen Frank LaRose [R]Rep Zack Milkovich [D]Sen Lou Gentile [D]Rep James Butler [R]
Rep Jim Buchy [R]Rep John Barnes [D]Rep Nickie Antonio [D]Rep Nancy Garland [D]
Sen Dave Burke [R]Sen Scott Oelslager [R]Rep Dale Mallory [D]Rep Matt Lundy [D]
Rep Thomas Letson [D]Sen Shannon Jones [R]Sen Jim Hughes [R]Sen Cliff Hite [R]
Rep Tracy Heard [D]Rep Jay Goyal [D]Rep Lorraine Fende [D]Rep Courtney Combs [R]
Rep Armond Budish [D]Rep Danny Bubp [R]Sen Edna Brown [D]Rep Louis Blessing [R]
Rep William Batchelder [R]Rep Barbara Sears [R]Sen Michael Skindell [D]Rep Terry Boose [R]
Rep Terry Blair [R]Rep Peter Beck [R]Sen Troy Balderson [R]Sen Joe Schiavoni [D]
Rep Roland Winburn [D]Sen Nina Turner [D]Sen Shirley Smith [D]Sen William Seitz [R]
Rep Kirk Schuring [R]Rep Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen Eric Kearney [D]Sen Capri Cafaro [D]
Rep Ron Amstutz [R]Sen Kenny Yuko [D]Rep Gerald Stebelton [R]Sen Kevin Bacon [R]

Roll Calls

2012-11-27 - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-14 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-13 Effective Date
2012-12-11 Governor' Action
2012-12-15 End of 10-day period
2012-12-04 Sent to Governor
2012-11-27 Concurrence
2012-05-03 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-03 Committee Report
2012-02-15 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2012-02-15 Introduced to House
2012-11-14 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-05-23 Committee Report - S
2012-05-08 To Health & Aging
2012-05-08 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3719Amended CodeCitation Text
371941Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4715Amended CodeCitation Text
4715033Amended CodeCitation Text
4715034Amended CodeCitation Text
471530Amended CodeCitation Text
4715301Amended CodeCitation Text
4715302Amended CodeCitation Text
4723Amended CodeCitation Text
4723487Amended CodeCitation Text
4725Amended CodeCitation Text
4725092Amended CodeCitation Text
4729Amended CodeCitation Text
472916Amended CodeCitation Text
4729162Amended CodeCitation Text
4729291Amended CodeCitation Text
472951Amended CodeCitation Text
4729552Amended CodeCitation Text
472957Amended CodeCitation Text
472979Amended CodeCitation Text
472980Amended CodeCitation Text
472986Amended CodeCitation Text
4730Amended CodeCitation Text
473053Amended CodeCitation Text
4731Amended CodeCitation Text
4731054Amended CodeCitation Text
4731055Amended CodeCitation Text
473122Amended CodeCitation Text
473139Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback