OH SB299 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Reported: Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Reported: Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1901.01, 1901.02, 1901.03, 1901.07, 1901.08, 1901.31, 1901.312, 1901.34, and 1907.11 of the Revised Code to create the Perry County Municipal Court in New Lexington on January 1, 2018, to establish one full-time judgeship in that court, to provide for the nomination of the judge by petition only, to abolish the Perry County County Court on that date, to designate the Perry County Clerk of Courts as the clerk of the Perry County Municipal Court, and to provide for the election for the Perry County Municipal Court of one full-time judge in 2017.
Title
Establishes the Perry County Municipal Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-07 | House | Reported: Judiciary |
2016-11-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2016-05-09 | House | Introduced |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Civil Justice |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
19 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 07 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |