OH SB28 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-24 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-24 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2903.21 and 2903.22 of the Revised Code to increase the penalties that apply to aggravated menacing and menacing under certain circumstances.
Title
Increase penalty for violating a protection order
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2019-09-23 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-23 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Passed |
2019-07-17 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Juvenile and Family Law
Juvenile and Family Law : Domestic Relations
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Juvenile and Family Law
Juvenile and Family Law : Domestic Relations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 03 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 03 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |